+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Adherence - Result was to Adhere
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adhere - CCR not produced
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- First Conference Committee Result was to Committee Recessed
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 24, 2016: Senate Health & Human Services: . .HB16-1183
March 24, 2016: Senate Health & Human Services: . .HB16-1183
February 23, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .HB16-1183
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor