+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor