+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Legislative Council
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs