+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Finance
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Finance