+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 11, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment