+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations