+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 25, 2014: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1178 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 7-0.
April 22, 2014: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1178, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 4-1.
April 22, 2014: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D). The motion passed on a vote of 4-1.
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor