+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 27, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor