+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Business, Labor, & Technology + Appropriations
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Appropriations