+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 4, 2024 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 10, 2024 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 10, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/19/2024 - No Amendments
On April 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On March 11, 2024 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 8, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 4, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
On January 31, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary