+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
April 30, 2013: Senate Health & Human Services: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment A), as amended. The motion passed without objection.
April 1, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - COW - amended The motion passed on a vote of 11-2.
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor