+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor