+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2016: Senate Health & Human Services: . .HB16-1168
February 23, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .HB16-1168
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor