+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy + Appropriations
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations