+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor