+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 25, 2013: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1165 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 5-4.
April 12, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
April 12, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1165, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor