+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services