+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government