+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary