+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 27, 2019 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations