+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary