+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Finance
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment + Finance