+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Finance
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Finance + Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 12, 2015: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C). The motion passed without objection.
March 12, 2015: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B). The motion passed without objection.
March 12, 2015: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D). The motion passed without objection.
March 12, 2015: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1159, as amended, to Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 6-5.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor