+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology + Appropriations
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Appropriations