+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2016: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .HB16-1156
March 22, 2016: House Business Affairs and Labor: . .HB16-1156
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor