+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 29, 2014: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1156 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 4-3.
April 24, 2014: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1156 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 4-3.
April 11, 2014: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection.
April 11, 2014: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection.
April 11, 2014: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 10-3.
February 10, 2014: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor