+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
- Sent to the Governor
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment