+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 11, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy