+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services + Appropriations