+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations