+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology + Finance + Appropriations
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Finance
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 8, 2015: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .HB15-1147
April 8, 2015: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .HB15-1147
March 13, 2015: House Appropriations: . .HB15-1147
March 13, 2015: House Appropriations: . .HB15-1147
March 5, 2015: House Finance: . .HB15-1147
February 19, 2015: House Health, Insurance, & Environment: . .HB15-1147
February 19, 2015: House Health, Insurance, & Environment: . .HB15-1147
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor