+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary