+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 24, 2024 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On March 11, 2024 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 8, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On February 29, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 26, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs