+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education + Appropriations
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 15, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1146 indefinitely. The motion passed on a vote of 5-4.
April 2, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor