+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Re-referred to Finance
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 7, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 13-1143 indefinitely. The motion passed on a vote of 12-0.
March 1, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1143 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 8-5.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor