+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance