+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance