+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor