+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor