+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs