+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/07/2018 - No Amendments
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services