+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs