+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education