+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 11, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 15, 2013: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1129 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 5-0.
March 27, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - COW - amended The motion passed on a vote of 10-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor