+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor