+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development