+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 8, 2016: Senate Transportation: . .HB16-1122
February 10, 2016: House Transportation & Energy: . .HB16-1122
February 10, 2016: House Transportation & Energy: . .HB16-1122
February 10, 2016: House Transportation & Energy: . .HB16-1122
February 10, 2016: House Transportation & Energy: . .HB16-1122
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor