+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/18/2021 - No Amendments
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/14/2021 - No Amendments
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/07/2021 - No Amendments
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor