+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 12, 2013: House Health, Insurance & Environment: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1121, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 10-1.
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor