+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Finance
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor